Satellite Central, Inc. v. Cox Business Services et al
Plaintiff: Satellite Central, Inc.
Defendant: Cox Business Services, Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh and Cox Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00440
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney William F. Hargens on behalf of Defendants Cox Business Services, Cox Communications, Inc., Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh (Hargens, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cox Communications, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Cox Business Services. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 INDEX in support of Brief #22 , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 Evidence Index by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of Defendants Cox Business Services, Cox Communications, Inc., Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Robert Nigh ISO MTD)(Hook, April)
November 26, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #21 by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of Defendants Cox Business Services, Cox Communications, Inc., Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh.(Hook, April)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of Defendants Cox Business Services, Cox Communications, Inc., Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh.(Hook, April)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Cox Communication - affidvait of service defendant Cox Communications, Inc. on 10/11/2019. (Nichols, Shawn)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Cox Business Services - Affidvait of Service defendant Cox Business Services on 10/11/2019. (Nichols, Shawn)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Filing No. #17 ). Defendants' answer or other responsive pleading is due on or before November 27, 2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney April N. Hook on behalf of Defendants Cox Business Services, Cox Communications, Inc., Joshua Farrell, Robert Nigh.(Hook, April)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Shawn M. Nichols on behalf of Plaintiff Satellite Central, Inc..(Nichols, Shawn)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Joshua Farrell on 10/18/2019. (Nichols, Shawn)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Nigh on 10/16/2019. (Nichols, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Cox Communications, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Joshua Farrell regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Robert Nigh regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Cox Business Services, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Cox Communications, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint #8 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Shawn M. Nichols on behalf of Satellite Central, Inc.(Nichols, Shawn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Satellite Central, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Robert Nigh, Joshua Farrell, Cox Business Services. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KMM)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Cox Business Services regarding Complaint #1 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Joshua Farrell regarding Complaint #1 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Robert Nigh regarding Complaint #1 . (Nichols, Shawn)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4035629), by Attorney Shawn M. Nichols on behalf of Satellite Central, Inc.(Nichols, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satellite Central, Inc. v. Cox Business Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Business Services
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Farrell
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nigh
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Communications, Inc.
Represented By: William F. Hargens
Represented By: April N. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satellite Central, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?