In The Matter Of: Berg et al
Debtor: Jason Thomas Berg and Mary Ann Berg
Trustee: Richard D Myers
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2019cv00452
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 INDEX to Trustee's Additional Evidence in Contempt Proceeding by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Trustee Richard D Myers. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard D. Myers)(King, James)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave. The Trustee shall file the Additional Evidence in Contempt Proceeding on or before December 16, 2019. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Submit Additional Evidence in Contempt Proceeding and Certificate of Service by Attorney James P. King on behalf of Trustee Richard D Myers.(King, James)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION that this bankruptcy proceeding be withdrawn to the U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) Ordered by Chief Judge Thomas L. Saladino. (KLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter Of: Berg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Jason Thomas Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Mary Ann Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Richard D Myers
Represented By: James P. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?