Sandine v. CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC
Plaintiff: Aaron Sandine
Defendant: CRW Mechanical Consultants, LLC and CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00470
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Plaintiff Aaron Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/18/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Defendant CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Amended Complaint #5 and Jury Demand by CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant CRW Mechanical Consultants, LLC, by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Aaron Sandine(Aranza, Raymond)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant CRW Mechanical Consultants, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Aaron Sandine from Sarpy County District Court, Case number CI19-1450 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4045834) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(McNamara, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandine v. CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Sandine
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRW Mechanical Consultants, LLC
Represented By: Katherine A. McNamara
Represented By: Robert W. Futhey
Represented By: John J. Waters, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC
Represented By: Katherine A. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?