Slater v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Bethany Slater
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America and Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan
Case Number: 8:2019cv00479
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER that pursuant to the Joint Stipulation Dismissing the Plan Defendant (Filing No. #12 ) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and (ii), defendant Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees, costs and expenses. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL of The Plan Defendant by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Davidson, Steven)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan shall file an answer or response on or before 12/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jason N.W. Plowman on behalf of Defendant Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan.(Plowman, Jason)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. Waiver sent on 11/22/2019. (Ravis, Talia)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Prudential Insurance Company Of America regarding Complaint #1 . (Ravis, Talia)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted - incorrect address listed on department of insurance as to defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Ravis, Talia)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan on 11/5/2019. (Ravis, Talia)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan and Prudential Insurance Company of America. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons request)(Ravis, Talia)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4049700), by Attorney Talia B. Ravis on behalf of Bethany Slater (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ravis, Talia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Health Initiatives Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By: Jason N.W. Plowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethany Slater
Represented By: Talia B. Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?