Liner v. State of Nebraska et al
Petitioner: Dan M. Liner
Respondent: Michell Capps, Scott R. Frakes and State of Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2019cv00486
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that:... (1) Upon initial review of the habeas corpus petition #1 , the court preliminarily determines that Petitioner's claims, as they are set forth in this Memorandum and Order, are potentially cognizable in federal court. (2) By January 27, 2020, Respondent must file a motion for summary judgment or state court records in support of an answer. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 27, 2020: deadline for Respondent to file state court records in support of answer or motion for summary judgment... (4)(F) The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 26, 2020: check for Respondent's answer and separate brief. (5)No discovery shall be undertaken without leave of the court. See Rule 6 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts.***Set Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 1/27/2020. Termed Pro Se Initial Review Assessment Deadline of 12/4/2019 re #1 and Pro Se Case Management Deadline of 12/5/2019 re #3 , at Judge Kopf's request. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER regarding filing fee paid on behalf of Petitioner Dan M. Liner. (LKO)
December 4, 2019 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of Dan M. Liner on 12/4/19. Receipt number 8054326, in the amount of $ 5.00. (ADB)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. It is ordered that: (1) Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. (2) The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). (3) The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: December 5, 2019: Check for MIFP or payment. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 12/5/2019.Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed/e-mailed to pro se party)(KLL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Dan M. Liner. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liner v. State of Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michell Capps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott R. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dan M. Liner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?