Sommerfeld et al v. Adesta, LLC
Plaintiff: Robert Sommerfeld, Gregory Benak and James Kawamoto
Defendant: Adesta, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00488
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF in support of Motion to Compel Arbitration by Attorney Robert M. Andalman on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC.(Andalman, Robert)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #8 by Attorney Nicholas F. Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregory Benak, James Kawamoto, Robert Sommerfeld.(Sullivan, Nicholas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 INDEX in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #8 by Attorney Nicholas F. Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiffs Gregory Benak, James Kawamoto, Robert Sommerfeld. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gregory Benak, #2 Exhibit Limited Liability Company and Partnership Agreement Dated as of November 16, 2009)(Sullivan, Nicholas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert M. Andalman on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC.(Andalman, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Rachael Blackburn. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF AND INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #8 by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Passarelli, John) Modified docket text on 11/12/2019 to include Index(ADB).
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC.(Passarelli, John)
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4055002 by Attorney Rachael Blackburn on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC.(Blackburn, Rachael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Robert Andalman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4054278 by Attorney Robert M. Andalman on behalf of Defendant Adesta, LLC.(Andalman, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (CS)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Adesta, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Gregory Benak, James Kawamoto, Robert Sommerfeld from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-8042 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4052597) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney John P. Passarelli on behalf of Adesta, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Arbitration Demand, #2 Exhibit Sommerfeld, et al v. Adesta, #3 Exhibit Pre-Filing Copy of Notice to State Court)(Passarelli, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sommerfeld et al v. Adesta, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sommerfeld
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Benak
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kawamoto
Represented By: Nicholas F. Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adesta, LLC
Represented By: Maggie L. Ebert
Represented By: John P. Passarelli
Represented By: Rachael Blackburn
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?