Strong v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mike K. Strong
Defendant: Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C., Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00505
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ryan K. Forrest on behalf of Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C..(Forrest, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF in support of Reply Brief #16 by Attorney Ryan K. Forrest on behalf of Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C..(Forrest, Ryan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #7 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Reece, Jarrod)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend. Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., shall have an extension of time to December 30, 2019, to file a brief in reply to their Motion to Dismiss #7 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Extend Time to File Reply Brief MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #7 , Response #13 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Reece, Jarrod)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Joint Defendants Motion to Dismiss on behalf of Plaintiff Mike K. Strong. (LKO)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Ryan K. Forrest on behalf of Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C..(Forrest, Ryan)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Ryan K. Forrest on behalf of Defendant Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C..(Forrest, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #7 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Deed of Trust, #2 Exhibit B: Assignment of Mortgage-Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Jarrod D. Reece)(Reece, Jarrod)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #7 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Reece, Jarrod)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A..(Reece, Jarrod)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp, Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., US Bancorp, US Bancorp.(Reece, Jarrod)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent LSF6 Services Operations, LLC, Corporate Parent LSF6 Services Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Defendants Caliber Home Loans, Inc., LSF6 Services Operations, LLC, LSF6 Services Operations, LLC.(Reece, Jarrod)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Caliber Home Loans, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JAB)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Mike K. Strong from Sarpy County District Court, Case number CI 19-1890 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4060016) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court file)(Reece, Jarrod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kozeny & McCubbin, L.C.
Represented By: Ryan K. Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike K. Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?