Cook v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jerome Cook
Defendant: United States of America and Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 8:2019cv00527
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Department of Veterans Affairs on 1/6/2020. (O'Brien, James)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United States of America on 1/6/2020. (O'Brien, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendant Department of Veterans Affairs (U.S. Attorney). YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to U.S. Attorney regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Brien, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Attorney General of U.S. regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Brien, James)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United States of America on 12/11/2019. (O'Brien, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Department of Veterans Affairs and United States of America. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to U.S. Dept. of Veterans Affairs regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Brien, James)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Attorney General of U.S. regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Brien, James)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew S. Buchanan has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Department of Veterans Affairs, United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4066699), by Attorney James V. O'Brien on behalf of Jerome Cook(O'Brien, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Cook
Represented By: Andrew S. Buchanan
Represented By: James V. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?