United States of America v. $110,000.00 In United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $110,000.00 In United States Currency
Counter Claimant: Julio Martinez
Case Number: 8:2019cv00531
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 19 Certificate of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/24/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion to Strike. Pursuant to the amended answer #15 and email communication from counsel for the parties, the United States' Motion to Strike #14 is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
January 23, 2020 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Julio Martinez (Monzon, Carlos)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #13 AND MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIM IN ANSWER by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
January 12, 2020 Filing 13 Claimant's ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM with jury demand against United States of America regarding Complaint #1 filed by United States of America by Julio Martinez (Monzon, Carlos)
January 3, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT Verified Claim (Rule G (5)(a)(ii) by Attorney Carlos A. Monzon on behalf of Claimant Julio Martinez.(Monzon, Carlos)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN of service UNEXECUTED of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant upon Julio J. Martinez by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(LKO)
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant on 12/10/19 upon Julio J. Martinez by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (LKO)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant on 12/6/19 upon U.S. Marshals Service. (LKO)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice, and Warrant on 12/9/19 upon Ali M. Abasi. (LKO)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #5 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM Issued. (E-mailed to USA) (LKO)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $110,000.00 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America(Blackburn, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $110,000.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $110,000.00 In United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Julio Martinez
Represented By: Carlos A. Monzon
Represented By: David V. Chipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?