Myers et al v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Claudia Myers and Donald Myers
Defendant: William Davis and Rose Marie Davis
Case Number: 8:2019cv00540
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Affidavit of Service defendant Rose Marie Davis on 1/6/2020. (Younes, Francis)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Affidavit of Service defendant William Davis on 1/6/2020. (Younes, Francis)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by February 26, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Leslie S. Stryker on behalf of Defendant William Davis.(Stryker, Leslie)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Rose Marie Davis and William Davis. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Rose Marie Davis regarding Complaint #1 . (Younes, Francis)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to William Davis regarding Complaint #1 . (Younes, Francis)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Francis E. Younes has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand Civil Cover Sheet against All Defendants, by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Claudia Myers, Donald Myers (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Younes, Francis)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4073470), by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Claudia Myers, Donald Myers(Younes, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers et al v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Davis
Represented By: Leslie S. Stryker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Marie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Myers
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Represented By: Gregory M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Myers
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Represented By: Gregory M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?