Lund-Ross Constructors v. Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lund-Ross Constructors
Defendant: Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC and Springfield First Community Bank
Case Number: 8:2019cv00550
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/9/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Counterclaim by Lund-Ross Constructors (Eichmann, Justin)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. (Filing No. #9 ). Lund-Ross Constructors shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in response to the Counterclaims filed by Defendant, on or before January 27, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ALW)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff Lund-Ross Constructors.(Eichmann, Justin)
December 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Lund-Ross Constructors regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,,, #1 filed by Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC by Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email with Payment Ledger, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Termination) (Weidner, J.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Vecino Student, LLC, Corporate Parent Natural Bridge Investors, LP for Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC. by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Defendants Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC, Vecino Student, LLC, Natural Bridge Investors, LP.(Fischer, Daniel)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Justin D. Eichmann on behalf of Plaintiff Lund-Ross Constructors.(Eichmann, Justin)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Lund-Ross Constructors, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Lund-Ross Constructors from District Court for Douglas County, Case number 19-8202 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney John D. Stalnaker on behalf of Springfield First Community Bank(Stalnaker, John)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Lund-Ross Constructors from District Court for Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-8202 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4076661) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Daniel J. Fischer on behalf of Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2-Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3-Praecipe, #4 Exhibit 4-Praecipe, #5 Exhibit 5-Praecipe, #6 Exhibit 6-Summons, #7 Exhibit 7-Summons, #8 Exhibit 8-Summons, #9 Exhibit 9-Proof of Service, #10 Exhibit 10-Proof of Service, #11 Exhibit 11-Proof of Service, #12 Exhibit 12-Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 13-Appearance by John Stalnaker, #14 Exhibit 14-Springfield First Community Bank Answer to Amended Complaint, #15 Exhibit 15--Springfield First Community Bank Consent to Removal)(Fischer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lund-Ross Constructors v. Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vecino Natural Bridge, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Luebbert
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Represented By: J. Daniel Weidner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springfield First Community Bank
Represented By: John D. Stalnaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lund-Ross Constructors
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Represented By: Justin D. Eichmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?