Gamez v. Swift Beef Company et al
Plaintiff: Reyna Gamez
Defendant: JBS USA, LLC and Swift Beef Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00551
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 11/6/20. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A telephonic status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on November 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #10 .) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #7 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that pursuant to the Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant JBS USA, LLC (Filing No. 6) under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), defendant JBS USA, LLC is dismissed without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Defendant Swift Beef Company.(Clark, Aaron)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT JBS USA, LLC by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Defendant Swift Beef Company.(Clark, Aaron)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Swift Beef Company's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Swift Beef Company (Clark, Aaron)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Swift Beef Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) Modified on 12/18/2019 to reflect that this was docketed in error and attorney notified (LKO).
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent JBS USA Food Company, Corporate Parent JBS USA Food Company Holdings for Swift Beef Company. by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Defendants Swift Beef Company, JBS USA Food Company, JBS USA Food Company Holdings.(Clark, Aaron)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Reyna Gamez from District Court of Hall County Nebraska, Case number CI 19-941 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4077247) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Aaron A. Clark on behalf of Swift Beef Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Clark, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamez v. Swift Beef Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reyna Gamez
Represented By: Joel A. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Beef Company
Represented By: Aaron A. Clark
Represented By: Cody E. Brookhouser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?