Davis v. Stadion Money Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY DAVIS
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00556
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas J. Kenny on behalf of Defendant Stadion Money Management, LLC (Kenny, Thomas)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Thomas J. Kenny has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Stadion Money Management, LLC (Buter, Victoria)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER - that the motions to withdraw filed by F. Hill Allen IV (Filing No. #97 ) and Carl F. Engstrom (Filing No. #98 ), as counsel of record for Plaintiff, are granted. F. Hill Allen IV and Carl F. Engstrom shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Carl F. Engstrom by Attorney Brock J. Specht on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service)(Specht, Brock)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Hill Allen by Attorney Brock J. Specht on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis. (Attachments: #1 A - Certificate of Service)(Specht, Brock)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw filed by Brent F. Powell of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP, as counsel of record for Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, (Filing No. #95 ), is granted. Brent F. Powell shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brent F. Powell of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP by Attorney James J. Frost on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Frost, James)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #91 for attorney Christopher J. Boran. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #90 for attorney Abbey M. Glenn. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #89 for attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4087399 by Attorney Christopher J. Boran on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Boran, Christopher)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4086800 by Attorney Abbey M. Glenn on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Glenn, Abbey)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4086781 by Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Blumenfeld, Jeremy)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #80 for attorney Paul J. Lukas. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #81 for attorney Brock J. Specht. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #82 for attorney Brandon T. McDonough. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #83 for attorney Grace I. Chanin. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #79 for attorney Kai Richter. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Grace Chanin Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4085642 by Attorney Grace Chanin on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis.(Chanin, Grace)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brandon McDonough Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4085634 by Attorney Brandon T. McDonough on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis.(McDonough, Brandon)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Brock J. Specht Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4085609 by Attorney Brock J. Specht on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis.(Specht, Brock)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul Lukas Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4085596 by Attorney Paul J. Lukas on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis.(Lukas, Paul)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kai Richter Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4085556 by Attorney Kai H. Richter on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis.(Richter, Kai)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Mark F. Enenbach on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Enenbach, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney James J. Frost on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Frost, James)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jeremy P. Blumenfeld has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christopher J. Boran has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brent F. Powell has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew L. Riffee has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney James O. Fleckner has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jennifer K. Van Zant has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney F. Hill Allen has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Abbey M. Glenn has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Paul Joseph Lukas has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kai H. Richter has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Carl F. Engstrom has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brock J. Specht has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brandon T. McDonough has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LAC)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00119. Original electronic file received.
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 12/20/2019; that Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue, (ECFNo. #32 ), is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. The Court declines to resolve Defendants' motions to dismiss, (ECF Nos. #42 ; #47 ), which shall be transferred, as part of this action, to the District of Nebraska. (Hicks, Samantha) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Change of Address by MATTHEW L. RIFFEE (RIFFEE, MATTHEW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Corrected document re #57 Notice (Other). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE re #57 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Replies due by 12/2/2019 (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE by KIMBERLY DAVIS re #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted: #32 MOTION to Change Venue , #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 REPLY, filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, to Response to #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Reply re #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Investopedia.com Stable Value Fund, #2 Exhibit 2 Babbel & Herce Stable Value Funds Performance, #3 Exhibit 3 McCaffree v Principal Class Action Complaint)(VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) Modified on 7/22/2019 to change event type/docket text(Coyne, Michelle). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS. Replies due by 7/22/2019 (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS. Replies due by 7/22/2019 (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld on 05/30/2019, that Plaintiff's responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss shall be due by June 24, 2019; Defendants' Reply memoranda shall be due by July 22, 2019; and any facts or argument Plaintiff incorporates by reference from one response brief to the other will not count against the word limit imposed by L.R. 7.3(d). (Coyne, Michelle) Modified on 5/31/2019 (Coyne, Michelle). [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #50 JOINT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Clarify Word Count Limits, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion No Longer Submitted #50 JOINT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Clarify Word Count Limits to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRANDON T. MCDONOUGH on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (MCDONOUGH, BRANDON) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Motions Submitted: #50 JOINT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Clarify Word Count Limits to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JOINT MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss and Clarify Word Count Limits by KIMBERLY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Christopher Boran filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Christopher Boran, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Declaration)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY, filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, to Response to #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RESPONSE in Support re #32 MOTION to Change Venue of United of Omaha, filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Replies due by 6/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Fleckner, #2 Declaration of Michael Isaac)(VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC re #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION of Matthew Riffee in Support of Stadion's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC re #42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Palace Plan Sponsor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - DOL Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Palace Entertainment 401(k) Plan 2012.1.1, #4 Exhibit D - 2012 401(k), #5 Exhibit E - 2013 401(k), #6 Exhibit F - Nichols Kaster 104 Request, #7 Exhibit G - Combined, #8 Exhibit H - Fi360 Stable Value Whitepaper, #9 Exhibit I - SVIA Quesitons Answered-401k Investing, #10 Exhibit J - Barron - No Stomach for Stock Market Swings-Consider Stable Value Funds)(VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/10/2019 (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Loretta C. Biggs on 05/14/2019, that the motion is GRANTED and United has leave to exceed the 6,250 - word limit in its brief in support of its motion to dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint. United's brief in support of the motion to dismiss shall not exceed 7,450 words. FURTHER that arguments incorporated by reference from Defendant Stadion Money Management's brief in support if its motion to dismiss shall not count against the word limit applicable to United's brief. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted: #40 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by KIMBERLY DAVIS re #36 Amended Complaint (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DECLARATION of Kai Richter filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS re #37 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS. (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS. Replies due by 5/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC, UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS.(RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of Abbey Glenn filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Tim Borman filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #32 MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Change Venue by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION of Christopher Boran filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY re #29 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DECLARATION of Matthew Riffee in Support of Stadion's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC re #27 Memorandum filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Palace Plan Sponsor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-DOL Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit C-Palace Entertainment 401(k) Plan 2012.1.1, #4 Exhibit D-2012-401(K), #5 Exhibit E- 2013-401(k), #6 Exhibit F-NK 104 Request, #7 Exhibit G-Combined)(VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC re #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2019 (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 04/15/2019 that United has leave to exceed the 6,250 - word limit in its brief in support of its motion to dismiss. United's brief in support of the motion to dismiss shall not exceed 7,450 words. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Answer updated for UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY to 4/19/2019. (Contreras, Jamie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond by 04/19/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 04/12/2019. (AULD, L.)[Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC. (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/10/2019. The motion for Leave to Exceed Word Limit (ECF No. #21 ) is GRANTED. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ("United"), has leave to exceed the 6,250-word limit in its brief in support of its motion to dismiss. United's briefs that will be submitted, shall not exceed 9,000 words combined. FURTHER, to the extent that United incorporates in the brief supporting its motion to dismiss arguments asserted by Defendant Stadion Money Management, LLC, the incorporated arguments shall not count toward the word limit for United's brief. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted: #21 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Word Limit to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES O. FLECKNER on behalf of Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC (FLECKNER, JAMES) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW L. RIFFEE on behalf of Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC (RIFFEE, MATTHEW) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER K. VAN ZANT on behalf of Defendant STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC (VAN ZANT, JENNIFER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for KIMBERLY DAVIS for Class Action Determination until date to be determined at Rule 16 conference, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Local Rule 23.1(b) Deadline. Plaintiffs' deadline to file their motion for class action determination is continued to a date to be determined. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/11/2019. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for KIMBERLY DAVIS for Class Action Determination until date to be determined at Rule 16 conference by KIMBERLY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ALLEN, F.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company shall answer or otherwise respond by 04/15/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/22/2019. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBERLY DAVIS. (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY DAVIS as to UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 1/29/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. BORAN on behalf of Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (BORAN, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by KIMBERLY DAVIS. STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC waiver sent on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ABBEY M. GLENN on behalf of Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (GLENN, ABBEY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEREMY P. BLUMENFELD on behalf of Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (BLUMENFELD, JEREMY) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENT F. POWELL on behalf of Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY shall answer or otherwise respond by 04/01/2019. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/14/2019. (AULD, L.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Motion Referred: RE: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARL F. ENGSTROM on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (ENGSTROM, CARL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL JOSEPH LUKAS on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (LUKAS, PAUL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KAI H. RICHTER on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BROCK J. SPECHT on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (SPECHT, BROCK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC, and UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2498817.), filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS.(ALLEN, F.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Case assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Stadion Money Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY DAVIS
Represented By: F. Hill Allen, IV
Represented By: Carl F. Engstrom
Represented By: Brock J. Specht
Represented By: Kai H. Richter
Represented By: Brandon T. McDonough
Represented By: Paul J. Lukas
Represented By: Grace Chanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent F. Powell
Represented By: Jeremy P. Blumenfeld
Represented By: Christopher J. Boran
Represented By: ABBEY M. GLENN
Represented By: James J. Frost
Represented By: Mark F. Enenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer K. Van Zant
Represented By: Matthew L. Riffee
Represented By: James O. Fleckner
Represented By: Thomas J. Kenny
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?