Martinique Properties, LLC v. Bisell, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martinique Properties, LLC
Defendant: Bisell, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv03092
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 7/21/2020. Telephone Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson to discuss the status of case progression and the parties' interest in settlement. Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson to discuss trial dates and settlement status. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in both telephone conferences. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Service for Def Rule 261 Disclosures by Attorney Robert S. Lannin on behalf of Defendant Bisell, Inc..(Lannin, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing on Rule 26(a) Disclosure by Attorney Matthew R. Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff Martinique Properties, LLC (Cohen, Matthew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Robert S. Lannin on behalf of Defendant Bisell, Inc..(Lannin, Robert)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert S. Lannin on behalf of Defendant Bisell, Inc..(Lannin, Robert)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to an email request from counsel, the deadline for Defendant to file its Corporate Disclosure Statement is extended to October 18, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Melinda Davis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4024574 by Attorney Melinda Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Martinique Properties, LLC.(Davis, Melinda)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Matthew Cohen. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4024367 by Attorney Matthew R. Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff Martinique Properties, LLC.(Cohen, Matthew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas M. Rowen on behalf of Plaintiff Martinique Properties, LLC.(Rowen, Thomas)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to Attorney Matthew R. Cohen) (KLF)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/18/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed to Attorney Matthew R. Cohen) (KLF)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Plaintiff by Bisell, Inc. (Lannin, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Bisell, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Martinique Properties, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew R. Cohen has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. The case number was changed to reflect to correct division pursuant to defendant's request for place of trial in the notice of removal. (KLF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Martinique Properties, LLC from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 19-6233 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNEDC-4015632) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert S. Lannin on behalf of Bissell, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lannin, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinique Properties, LLC v. Bisell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martinique Properties, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Rowen
Represented By: Matthew R. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bisell, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S. Lannin
Represented By: Christopher M. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?