United States of America v. $50,596.05 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $50,596.05 United States Currency
Case Number: 8:2020cv00031
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Service of UNITED STATES's SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 Verified CLAIM by Alfredo Valencia Hinostroza (Capozzi, Anthony)
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Anthony P. Capozzi. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Oath of Admission for Pro Hac Vice Motion by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency (Capozzi, Anthony)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4119401 by Attorney Anthony P. Capozzi on behalf of Defendant $50,596.05 United States Currency.(Capozzi, Anthony)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Complaint, Notice and Warrant on 1/27/2020 upon U.S. Customs and Border Protection by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION - This matter is before the Court on the Motion for Publication (Filing No. #4 ), filed by the United States of America. The Motion is granted and the United States is directed to publish such notification as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION FOR PUBLICATION by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Blackburn, Amy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 WARRANT IN REM Issued. Emailed to USA. (LKO)
January 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $50,596.05 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, by Attorney Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Blackburn, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $50,596.05 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $50,596.05 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?