In Re: Vernetta Vivian Watson
Defendant: Vernetta Vivian Watson and Vernetta V. Watson
Trustee: U.S. Trustee and Kathleen Laughlin
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2020cv00103
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (LKO)
April 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Pending for the Notice of Appeal on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Supersedeas Bond and Notice of Appeal Undertaking on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Request for Transcript and Request for Bill of Exceptions on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Notice of Filing Bankruptcy #1 on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Injunctive Relief on behalf of Defendant Vernetta Vivian Watson. (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appeal and Order at 66 . (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Transcript. (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and Order at 64 . (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Waive Fee and Order at 62 . (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PAY FILING FEE. (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 TRANSMISSION OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL RECORD with bankruptcy docket sheet from USBC-Nebraska, Case Number BK16-80940. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (LKO)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy Appeal. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Vernetta Vivian Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta Vivian Watson
Represented By: Bruce C. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta V. Watson
Represented By: Bruce C. Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jerry L. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kathleen Laughlin
Represented By: Kathleen A. Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?