Goldtooth v. Western Sugar Cooperative
Plaintiff: Cody Goldtooth
3Rd Party Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company and DSI Mechanical, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Western Sugar Cooperative
Case Number: 8:2020cv00113
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 21 RETURN of service of Third-Party Complaint on 5/11/20 upon DSI Mechanical, LLC c/o Richard Bogaard, Secretary by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative.(Ahl, Stephen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 20 RETURN of service of Third-Party Complaint on 5/11/20 upon DSI Mechanical, LLC c/o Brian Pistulka, Treasurer/Director by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative.(Ahl, Stephen)
May 14, 2020 Filing 19 RETURN of service of Third-Party Complaint on 5/11/20 upon DSI Mechanical, LLC c/o Craig Pistulka, President by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Third Party Plaintiff Western Sugar Cooperative.(Ahl, Stephen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Third Party defendant DSI Mechanical, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to DSI MECHANICAL, LLC regarding Third Party Complaint #12 . (Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Brian Pistulka regarding Third Party Complaint #12 . (Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Requested as to Richard Bogaard regarding Third Party Complaint #12 . (Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Requested as to Michael Wavra regarding Third Party Complaint #12 . (Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to Craig Pistulka regarding Third Party Complaint #12 . (Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against DSI Mechanical, LLC, by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Western Sugar Cooperative (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahl, Stephen)
May 7, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Western Sugar Cooperative (Ahl, Stephen)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative.(Ahl, Stephen)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before May 8, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stephen L. Ahl on behalf of Defendant Western Sugar Cooperative.(Ahl, Stephen)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendant Western Sugar Cooperative. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to WESTERN SUGAR COOPERATIVE regarding Complaint, #1 . (High, Justin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to WESTERN SUGAR COOPERATIVE regarding Complaint, #1 . (High, Justin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to WESTERN SUGAR COOPERATIVE regarding Complaint, #1 . (High, Justin)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand by Cody Goldtooth, Plaintiff against Western Sugar Cooperative ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4136502), by Attorney Justin W. High on behalf of cody goldtooth (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(High, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldtooth v. Western Sugar Cooperative
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: DSI Mechanical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Western Sugar Cooperative
Represented By: Stephen L. Ahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Goldtooth
Represented By: Justin W. High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?