Anderson v. Bank of the West et al
Plaintiff: David R. Anderson
Defendant: Bank of the West, U.S. Bank National Association, Real Name Not Known and John Doe
Case Number: 8:2020cv00114
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Sawyer, #2 Exhibit A 12-15-19 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B Anderson Deed of Trust)(Sawyer, Ryan)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #14 by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision and remains assigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Supplemental by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying U.S. Bank's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #5 ) without prejudice to U.S. Bank's right to file a motion to dismiss Anderson's Second Amended Complaint on or before May 14, 2020. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Terry K. Barber on behalf of David R. Anderson(Barber, Terry)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before April 22, 2020, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" form located on the courts website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #5 by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan Sawyer, #2 Exhibit A 12-15-19 Order on Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit B Anderson Deed of Trust)(Sawyer, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #5 by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Ryan A. Sawyer on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Sawyer, Ryan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Attorney Theresa D. Koller on behalf of Defendant U.S. Bank National Association.(Koller, Theresa)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent US Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association. by Attorney Theresa D. Koller on behalf of Defendants U.S. Bank National Association, US Bancorp.(Koller, Theresa)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against David R. Anderson from Lancaster County District Court, Case number CI 19-1292 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4136808) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Theresa D. Koller on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Koller, Theresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Bank of the West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Represented By: Matthew J. Kivett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Theresa D. Koller
Represented By: Ryan A. Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Name Not Known
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R. Anderson
Represented By: Terry K. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?