Fields v. Douglas County Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Howard W. Fields, 2nd
Defendant: Ashley Hamilton, Nemanja Vidakovic, Douglas County Corrections and Otte
Case Number: 8:2020cv00131
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Howard Fields on 05/11/20. Receipt number 8056117, in the amount of $ 6.03. (ADB)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motions (filing no. #6 ; filing no. #7 ) are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $6.03 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: May 18, 2020: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution/e-mailed to finance) (LKO)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Subpoena on behalf of Plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd. (LKO)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT regarding Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd. (LKO)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (ADB)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd.(ADB)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas County Corrections, Ashley Hamilton, Otte, Nemanja Vidakovic; no Summonses issued; filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Howard W. Fields, 2nd.(ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Douglas County Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nemanja Vidakovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard W. Fields, 2nd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?