Renteria v. Nebraska Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Chasin Renteria
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Corrections and Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Case Number: 8:2020cv00166
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The clerk of the court is directed to correct the docket sheet to change the name of Defendant from "Nebraska Department of Corrections" to "Nebraska Department of Correctional Services." For service of process of process on the Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, the clerk of the court is directed to complete a summons form and USM-285 form using the following address: Nebraska Attorney General, 2115 State Capitol, Lincoln, NE 68509. The clerk of the court shall forward the summons form and USM-285form together with a copy of the Amended Complaint (Filing No. #8 ) and a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the Marshals Service. The Marshals Service shall serve the Nebraska Department of Correctional Services at the above-listed address by "leaving the summons at the office of the Attorney General with the Attorney General, deputy attorney general, or someone designated in writing by the Attorney General, or by certified mail or designated delivery service addressed to the office of the Attorney General." Neb. Rev. Stat. 25-510.02(1) (prescribed method for serving the State of Nebraska or any state agency). The United States Marshal shall serve all process in this case without prepayment of fees from Plaintiff. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) requires service of the complaint on a defendant within 90 days of filing the complaint. However, Plaintiff is granted, on the court's own motion, an extension of time until 90 days from the date of this order to complete service of process. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: "September 21, 2020: check for service." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party; provided to USM as directed for service)(LKO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Chasin Renteria. (LKO)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Nebraska Department of Corrections filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Chasin Renteria. (LKO)
June 12, 2020 TEXT ENTRY THAT PARTIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Chasin P. Renteria on 06/11/2020. Receipt number 8056490, in the amount of $ 9.00. (LRM)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the court's own motion, Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to file an Amended Complaint that states a claim upon which relief may be granted. Failure to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days will result in the court dismissing this case without further notice to Plaintiff. The clerk of the court is directed to set the following pro se case management deadline: "July 6, 2020: check for amended complaint." Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 26, 2020 TEXT ENTRY THAT INITIAL FILING fee paid on behalf of Chasin Renteria on 5/26/20. Receipt number 8056302, in the amount of $.30. (ADB)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $.30 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: June 3, 2020: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party & plaintiff's institution; e-mailed to finance)(LKO)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Chasin Renteria. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Chasin Renteria. (LKO)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nebraska Department of Corrections filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Chasin Renteria. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renteria v. Nebraska Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chasin Renteria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nebraska Department of Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?