Union Pacific Railroad Co. v. Timmons
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Defendant: Bryan R. Timmons
Case Number: 8:2020cv00191
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4199196 by Attorney Russell Shankland on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Shankland, Russell)
July 8, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #23 for attorney Joe Rebein. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Oath of Admission by Attorney Joe Rebein on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co. (Rebein, Joe)
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joe Rebein Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4192136 by Attorney Joe Rebein on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Rebein, Joe)
July 6, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #12 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Public Law Board No. 6459 Case no. 4)(Cummings, Daniel)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Unopposed Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to July 6, 2020, to file a brief in reply to the Motion to Remand #12 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to file Reply Brief in Support of MOTION to Remand #12 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Cummings, Daniel)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER - After review of Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal #18 , Brice Kenfack is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff, which remains represented by other counsel. The show cause deadline #17 is terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Brice Nengsu Kenfack by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co. (Cummings, Daniel)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - On or before July 8, 2020, Brice Kenfack shall either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #12 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons.(O'Connor, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration John McArthur)(O'Connor, Robert)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons.(O'Connor, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #12 (Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of its Motion for Remand) by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Cummings, Daniel)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Cummings, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co..(Cummings, Daniel)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that this case is reassigned to District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Daniel E. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff Union Pacific Railroad Co. (Cummings, Daniel)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before June 8, 2020, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" form located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit John McArthur Declaration)(O'Connor, Robert)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #5 by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons.(O'Connor, Robert)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan R. Timmons.(O'Connor, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Brice Kenfack has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 to Plaintiff by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Defendant Bryan Timmons (O'Connor, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Union Pacific Railroad Co. from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI20-1812 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4163786) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Robert E. O'Connor, Jr. on behalf of Bryan Timmons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(O'Connor, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Co. v. Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Co.
Represented By: Brice Nengsu Kenfack
Represented By: Russell Shankland
Represented By: Daniel E. Cummings
Represented By: Joe Rebein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan R. Timmons
Represented By: Richard S. Edelman
Represented By: Robert E. O'Connor, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron S. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?