Perez et al v. Century Asphalt Company et al
Plaintiff: David V. Perez and Debra K. Perez
Defendant: Century Asphalt Company and Stephen Dale Ferguson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00210
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23 U.S.C. ยง 134
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Century Asphalt Company, Stephen Dale Ferguson (Reilly, Matthew)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 31, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 3, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants Century Asphalt Company, Stephen Dale Ferguson.(Reilly, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew B. Reilly on behalf of Defendants Century Asphalt Company, Stephen Dale Ferguson (Reilly, Matthew)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Century Asphalt Company on 6/18/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Stephen Dale Ferguson on 6/11/2020. (Cullan, Patrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Century Asphalt Company and Stephen Dale Ferguson. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Stephen Dale Ferguson regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Century Asphalt Company regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4171267), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Debra K. Perez, David V Perez(Cullan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez et al v. Century Asphalt Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Asphalt Company
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Dale Ferguson
Represented By: Matthew B. Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David V. Perez
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra K. Perez
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?