Magnet Solutions, Inc. v. Foremost Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Magnet Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00238
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due May 3, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on May 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant Foremost Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/10/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Foremost Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Financial Services Group for Foremost Insurance Company. by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendants Foremost Insurance Company, Farmers Group, Inc., Zurich Financial Services Group.(Rezac, Rex)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Mullin on behalf of Plaintiff Magnet Solutions, Inc..(Mullin, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Magnet Solutions, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Foremost Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Magnet Solutions, Inc. from Scotts Bluff County District Court, Case number 20-278 with attached state court pleadings (Filing fee $400, receipt number ANEDC-4180881), by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rezac, Rex) Modified on 6/19/2020 to add receipt number (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnet Solutions, Inc. v. Foremost Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnet Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?