Kaufman v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Ryan Kaufman
Defendant: Jo Griffith and United States of America
Case Number: 8:2020cv00248
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. #18 ) is accepted. Any objections are deemed waived. The United States Attorney's Notice of Substitution (Filing No. #8 ) and supporting Certification (Filing No. 8-1) are approved. The United States of America is substituted for Jo Griffith as the party defendant in this case. See 28 U.S.C. 2679(d)(2). Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman's Motion to Remand (Filing No. #10 ) is denied in its entirety. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION - IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS RECOMMENDED to the Honorable Robert F. Rossiter, United States District Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), that: a. The motion for remand filed by the plaintiff, (Filing No. #10 ) be denied; b. The governments motion, (Filing No. #8 ), be granted, and c. The United States be substituted as the named defendant in this case. The defendant is notified that failing to file an objection to this recommendation as provided in the local rules of this court may be held to be a waiver of any right to appeal the court's adoption of the recommendation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 INDEX in support of Reply Brief #16 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Substitute Party #8 , Brief #15 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank)
July 14, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett)
July 14, 2020 Filing 14 INDEX in opposition to by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jo Griffith, Domiciliary Chief or Program Manager in Grand Island)(Wagner, Lynnett)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is continued pending a ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Filing No. 10). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 INDEX in support of Brief #11 , MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Aerni, Frank)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Remand #10 by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank)
June 30, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Frank M. Aerni on behalf of Plaintiff Ryan Kaufman.(Aerni, Frank)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #7 Declaration as to Filing Notice of Notice of Removal by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, Certification by U.S. Attorney Joseph P. Kelly)(Wagner, Lynnett)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ryan Kaufman from District Court in Hall County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-388 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Jo Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attached State Court Pleadings)(Wagner, Lynnett)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint #1 and Motion to Substitute Party #3 are stricken for the following reason: documents are not signed. The party is directed to re-file the document. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 STRICKEN - MOTION to Substitute Party by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Wagner, Lynnett) Modified on 6/25/2020 to strike per order 6 (ADB).
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION as to Filing Notice of Notice of Removal by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Jo Griffith.(Wagner, Lynnett)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 STRICKEN - NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Ryan Kaufman from District Court of Hall County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-388 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Jo Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wagner, Lynnett) Modified on 6/25/2020 to strike per order 6 (ADB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Griffith
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kaufman
Represented By: Frank M. Aerni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?