Van Ostberg v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jason Van Ostberg
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00284
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Case transferred to District of USDC-Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (TCL)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(TCL)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (TCL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this action are stayed until further order of the Court. The parties shall file a report advising as to the status of this action by September 21, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that due to clerical error, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (TCL)
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Chattem, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MLF)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Jason Van Ostberg from District Court of Pierce County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-0039 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4198258) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Chattem, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Ostberg v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Van Ostberg
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?