Panchal Enterprises v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Panchal Enterprises d/b/a Americas Best Value Inn doing business as Americas Best Value Inn and Panchal Enterprises doing business as Americas Best Value Inn
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00295
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Initial Disclosures by Attorney Matthew R. Pearson on behalf of Plaintiff Panchal Enterprises.(Pearson, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 5/3/21. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on May 7, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rezac, Rex)
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Matthew R. Pearson on behalf of Plaintiff Panchal Enterprises.(Pearson, Matthew)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #10 for attorney Matthew R. Pearson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4212663 by Attorney Matthew R. Pearson on behalf of Plaintiff Panchal Enterprises. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rezac, Rex)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/1/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint,, #1 and Demand for Jury Trial by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew R. Pearson has not registered for admittance to practice registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (ADB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Panchal Enterprises d/b/a Americas Best Value Inn. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Panchal Enterprises d/b/a Americas Best Value Inn from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI20-4880 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4203519) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Roper, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Jay Rine, #4 Exhibit District Court Pleadings)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Panchal Enterprises v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panchal Enterprises d/b/a Americas Best Value Inn doing business as Americas Best Value Inn
Represented By: Matthew R. Pearson
Represented By: Terrence J. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Panchal Enterprises doing business as Americas Best Value Inn
Represented By: Terrence J. Salerno
Represented By: Matthew R. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?