Med-Den Funding, LLC v. Abenaim et al
Plaintiff: Med-Den Funding, LLC
Defendant: Jonathan M Abenaim, Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry and Jonathan M. Abenaim
Case Number: 8:2020cv00310
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of Partial Transcript of Proceedings before District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. held on September 16, 2020. Total Number of Billable Pages: 55. Total Number of Pages: 1-55. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Susan M. DeVetter at (402) 661-7309 or suedevetter@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 10/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2020. (SMD)
September 30, 2020 Filing 34 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Keith Graham regarding Order on Motion to Extend 33 , Motion to Extend #32 and Witness List #31 . E-mail resent to kgraham@ekoklaw.com. (Attachments: #1 Returned mail 9/25/20, #2 Returned mail 9/28/20) (MKR)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Extend. The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is continued to 10/7/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 32 JOINT MOTION to Extend Time by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Olson, Stephen)
September 16, 2020 Filing 31 WITNESS LIST from hearing held on 9/16/2020 regarding Minutes 30 .(MLF)
September 16, 2020 Filing 30 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. on 9/16/2020. Motion Hearing regarding #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by plaintiff. The parties addressed the court's question regarding diversity jurisdiction. Evidence by the plaintiff. Argument by parties. Motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record. No written order to follow. Appearance for plaintiff: Marnie A. Jensen and Kamron T.M. Hasan; Appearance for defendant: Stephen G. Olson, II and Keith M. Graham; Courtroom Deputy: Marian Lea Frahm; Court Reporter: Time Start: 1:34 PM; Time Stop: 3:41 PM; Time in Court: 2 Hours. (MLF)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Quinn R. Eaton is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kamron T.M. Hasan on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC (Hasan, Kamron)
September 14, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Quinn R. Eaton by Attorney Marnie A. Jensen on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Jensen, Marnie)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #9 . Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MLF)
September 9, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #9 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Eaton, Quinn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Olson, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 INDEX in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Errata)(Olson, Stephen)
September 2, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Olson, Stephen)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting defendants' motion for an extension (Filing No. #18 ). Jonathan M. Abeniam and Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry, LLC shall file their response to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction (Filing No. #9 ) by September 2, 2020. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed by September 9, 2020. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 INDEX in support of Brief #19 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Eaton, Quinn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #18 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Eaton, Quinn)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Olson, Stephen)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/25/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (ADB)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry and Jonathan M. Abenaim (Olson, Stephen) Modified on 9/4/2020 to include answer is also for Jonathan M. Abenaim (ADB).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. A. Victor Rawl, Henry W. Frampton, and Earl G. Greene are terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Jonathan M. Abenaim, Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Rawl, A.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Defendants Jonathan M. Abenaim, Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry (Rawl, A.) Modified on 8/18/2020 (LRH).
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 INDEX in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #9 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eaton, Quinn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #9 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Eaton, Quinn)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Eaton, Quinn)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry (Olson, Stephen)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by August 25, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry.(Olson, Stephen)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Quinn R. Eaton on behalf of Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC.(Eaton, Quinn)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Med-Den Funding, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Med-Den Funding, LLC from District Court of Lancaster County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-2371 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4211089) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney A. Victor Rawl, Jr. on behalf of Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry, Jonathan M Abenaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Rawl, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Med-Den Funding, LLC v. Abenaim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Med-Den Funding, LLC
Represented By: Quinn R. Eaton
Represented By: David A. Lopez
Represented By: Marnie A. Jensen
Represented By: Kamron T.M. Hasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M Abenaim
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: Henry Frampton
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Dental Spa at the Center for Cosmetic & Implant Dentistry
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: Henry Frampton
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Represented By: Keith M. Graham
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M. Abenaim
Represented By: Earl G. Greene, III
Represented By: Henry Frampton
Represented By: A. Victor Rawl, Jr.
Represented By: Keith M. Graham
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?