The James Skinner Co. v. All Food Equipment, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The James Skinner Co.
Defendant: All Food Equipment, LLC and Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00316
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant All Food Equipment, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendant Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant All Food Equipment, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 INDEX in support of Brief #14 , MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens #13 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (A-B))(Tanner, Trenton)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens #13 by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael T. Hilgers on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC (Hilgers, Michael)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading on or before September 22, 2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC.(Tanner, Trenton)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Trenton D. Tanner on behalf of Defendants All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC (Tanner, Trenton)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant All Food Equipment, LLC on 8/11/2020. (Kunhart, Ryan)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ryan M. Kunhart on behalf of Plaintiff The James Skinner Co..(Kunhart, Ryan)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff The James Skinner Co. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants All Food Equipment, LLC and Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Kunhart, Ryan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Kunhart, Ryan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Food Equipment, LLC, Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4212020), by Attorney Ryan M. Kunhart on behalf of The James Skinner Co.(Kunhart, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The James Skinner Co. v. All Food Equipment, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The James Skinner Co.
Represented By: Tiffany S. Boutcher
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Food Equipment, LLC
Represented By: Trenton D. Tanner
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bakery Technology Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Trenton D. Tanner
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?