Kobylasz v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Kobylasz
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.,, Chattem, Inc., Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Walgreen, Co., Walmart Stores, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00337
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LKO)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Consent of Removal from Douglas County District Court by Attorney Devin A. Moss on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Moss, Devin)
September 9, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (LKO)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #20 for attorney Devin Moss. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4229327 by Attorney Devin A. Moss on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc..(Moss, Devin)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LKO)
August 28, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of consent of removal from Douglas County District Court regarding Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen, Co. (Chibe, Russell) Modified docket text on 8/31/2020 to reflect document is a notice of consent(ADB).
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney Russell Chibe. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4226339 by Attorney Russell J. Chibe on behalf of Defendants Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen, Co..(Chibe, Russell)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - that Defendants' Agreed Motion to Stay (Filing No. #3 ) is granted and all proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending its transfer to MDL 2924. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
August 21, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Pfizer Inc.,. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Chattem, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi US Services, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph G. Petrosinelli has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice no registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc.,, Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Pfizer Inc.,, Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-6208 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4222276) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Pfizer Inc.,, Chattem, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kobylasz v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.,
Represented By: Joseph G. Petrosinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen's Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Russell J. Chibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen, Co.
Represented By: Russell J. Chibe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Devin A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Kobylasz
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?