United States et al v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services
Plaintiff: United States, State of Nebraska and United States of America
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services
Case Number: 8:2020cv00351
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: John M Gerrard
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT - On the terms set forth in the accompanying consent decree, judgment is hereby entered pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT DECREE. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the United States' motion to enter the proposed consent decree (filing #6 ) is granted. The signed consent decree will be separately entered. A separate judgment will be entered. This case is closed. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF UNOPPOSED MOTION to Enter Proposed Consent Decree #6 by Attorney Rachel A. Hankey on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Hankey, Rachel)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Enter Proposed Consent Decree by Attorney Rachel A. Hankey on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Hankey, Rachel)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to the unexpected and untimely death of Senior U.S. District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, this case is reassigned to Judge John M. Gerrard. The assigned magistrate judge remains the same for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard.(DKM)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that due to clerical error, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lodging of Proposed Consent Decree by Attorney Rachel A. Hankey on behalf of Plaintiff United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree)(Hankey, Rachel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT United States and the State of Nebraska against Clean Harbors Environmental Services, by Attorney Rachel A. Hankey on behalf of United States(Hankey, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States et al v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Rachel A. Hankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Nebraska
Represented By: Maegan L. Woita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rachel A. Hankey
Represented By: Laurie A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?