O'Neill Farms, Inc. v. Siverson
Plaintiff: O'Neill Farms, Inc.
Defendant: Gary Siverson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00360
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due September 15, 2021. Planning Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Plaintiff O'Neill Farms, Inc..(Krause, Ronald)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Due to the unexpected and untimely death of Senior U.S. District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, this case is reassigned to Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. The assigned magistrate judge remains the same for judicial supervision and processing of all pretrial matters. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard.(DKM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Plaintiff O'Neill Farms, Inc..(Krause, Ronald)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Plaintiff O'Neill Farms, Inc. (Huffer, Michael)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ronald F. Krause on behalf of Plaintiff O'Neill Farms, Inc. (Krause, Ronald)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 10/19/2020.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Gary Siverson (Houghton, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff O'Neill Farms, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against O'Neill Farms, Inc. from Holt County District, Case number CI 20-130 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4232320) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney David S. Houghton on behalf of Gary Siverson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Holt County District Court Complaint)(Houghton, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill Farms, Inc. v. Siverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Siverson
Represented By: David S. Houghton
Represented By: Keith A. Harvat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Neill Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Forrest F. Peetz
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Ronald F. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?