Kugler et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Plaintiff: Peggy A. Kugler and Lane N. Kugler
Defendant: Chattem, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Apotex Corp., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Sanofi US Services Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Walmart Stores, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00369
Filed: September 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Case transferred to District of USDC - Southern District of Florida. Original electronic file sent. (LAC)
September 30, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (LAC)
September 29, 2020 Filing 27 COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Southern District of Florida, Docket No. 2924. (LKO)
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Consent of Removal from Dawson County District Court by Attorney Devin A. Moss on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc. (Moss, Devin)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #24 for attorney Devin A. Moss. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
September 22, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4241305 by Attorney Devin A. Moss on behalf of Defendant Walmart Stores, Inc..(Moss, Devin)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that that Defendants' Agreed Motion to Stay (Filing No. #3 ) is granted and all proceedings in this action are hereby stayed pending its transfer to MDL 2924. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Apotex Corp. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 20 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant AmerisourceBergen Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Chattem, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jane Thomas has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Terry M. Henry has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Georgia Hatzis has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Paul J. Cosgrove has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Lauren E. O'Donnell has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Larry R. Wood, Jr. has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert B. Friedman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew T. Bayman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julia Zousmer has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Stay by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Apotex Corp., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(Huffer, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Apotex Corp., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Huffer, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Lane N. Kugler, Peggy A. Kugler from District Court of Dawson County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-322 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4237680) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Chattem, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Apotex Corp., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Huffer, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kugler et al v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Georgia Hatzis
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Jane Thomas
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Lauren E. O'Donnell
Represented By: Larry R. Wood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Devin A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: John A. McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Georgia Hatzis
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Julia Zousmer
Represented By: Andrew T. Bayman
Represented By: Robert B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy A. Kugler
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane N. Kugler
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?