Gaines et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Katherine Crouse-Dazzo and Troy Gaines
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv00385
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiffs' Rule 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures by Attorney Cory R. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiffs Katherine Crouse-Dazzo, Troy Gaines (Wilson, Cory)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - This matter is before the Court after review of the parties' Amended Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Filing No. #14 ). After a review of the report, the Court finds good cause to amend the case progression order. The planning conference scheduled for July 9, 2021, is cancelled. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on August 6, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Amended Rule 26(f) Planning Report by Attorney Cory R. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff Troy Gaines.(Wilson, Cory)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in the Rule 26(f) Meeting Report, (Filing No. #9 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Planning Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (KLF)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LRM)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Cory R. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiffs Katherine Crouse-Dazzo, Troy Gaines.(Wilson, Cory)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Cory R. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiffs Katherine Crouse-Dazzo, Troy Gaines (Wilson, Cory)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/5/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Rezac, Rex)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Rezac, Rex)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from Douglas County District Court, Case number 20-6572 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4244289) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Crouse-Dazzo
Represented By: Tiernan T. Siems
Represented By: Cory R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Gaines
Represented By: Tiernan T. Siems
Represented By: Cory R. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?