Becker v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Susanne Becker and Susanne R. Hurd
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Postmaster General, Mark Dimondstein and Fredric V. Rolando
Case Number: 8:2020cv00394
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Strike Brief #21 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne)
November 17, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #13 Reply Memorandum in Support by Attorney Kate M. Swearengen on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando.(Swearengen, Kate)
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Memorandum in Support #14 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hurd, Susanne)
November 11, 2020 Filing 19 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #13 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd.(Hurd, Susanne) Modified on 11/12/2020 to reflect document is a brief and not a motion (MKR).
November 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment against APWU and Mark Dimondstein on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hurd, Susanne)
November 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #13 on behalf of Plaintiff Susanne R. Hurd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit motion of strike)(Hurd, Susanne)
November 10, 2020 CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Susanne Becker (also known as Susanne R. Hurd). Access granted on 11/10/20. Plaintiff's name was modified on this case to match the name on her PACER account. The plaintiff's name on the docket sheet now reflects Susanne R. Hurd with an alias of Susanne Becker. (JLS)
November 9, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE OF INCORRECT EVENT used when filing the Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 by Deputy Clerk. In the future, use the event Brief.(MKR)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of the MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Kate M. Swearengen on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando.(Swearengen, Kate) Modified on 11/9/2020 to reflect document is a brief and not a motion(MKR).
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Kate M. Swearengen on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando.(Swearengen, Kate)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Although the motion is opposed, the Court nevertheless finds good cause exists to grant the extension and finds plaintiff will not be prejudiced. Defendants United States Postal Service and Postmaster DeJoy shall have an extension of time to December 9, 2020, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendants Postmaster General, United States Postal Service.(Wagner, Lynnett)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kate M. Swearengen on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando (Swearengen, Kate)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant Fredric V. Rolando shall have an extension of time to November 9, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jason R. McClitis on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando.(McClitis, Jason)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Jason R. McClitis by Attorney Jason R. McClitis on behalf of Defendant Fredric V. Rolando (McClitis, Jason)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LRM)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants, United States Postal Service and Postmaster General, Louis DeJoy, shall have an extension of time to November 9, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States Postal Service and Postermaster General, Louis DeJoy.(Wagner, Lynnett)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant United States Postal Service and Postermaster General, Louis DeJoy.(Wagner, Lynnett)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Susanne Becker from District Court of Scottsbluff County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-509 with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of United States Postal Service and Postermaster General, Louis DeJoy (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Wagner, Lynnett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postmaster General
Represented By: Lynnett M. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dimondstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fredric V. Rolando
Represented By: Kate M. Swearengen
Represented By: Jason R. McClitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susanne R. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?