ProBLAC et al v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: ProBLAC, Joshua Augustine, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson, Jordan Corbin, Darren Renfrow, Alexander Matthews, Melanie Buer and Katelyn Huckins
Defendant: City of Omaha, Mark Matuza and Todd Schmaderer
Case Number: 8:2020cv00400
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting 34 Unopposed Email Motion. Defendants shall have an extension of time to December 11, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 1, 2020 Filing 34 UNOPPOSED TEXT EMAIL MOTION - by counsel for defendants requesting an extension of time to file a responsive pleading. (SMN)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER - THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED THAT defendants' motion to strike, Filing No. #20 , is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
November 19, 2020 Filing 32 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for telephone conference held on November 18, 2020, with counsel for the parties before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Discussion held regarding case progression and pending motions. A status conference with counsel for the parties is scheduled for December 7, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., in chambers, before the undersigned magistrate judge. Counsel are to exchange proposals on or before December 2, 2020. For good cause shown and without objection, Plaintiffs shall have an extension of time to December 14, 2020, to file their reply brief in support of the #12 Motion for Leave to Conduct Early Discovery. (JLM)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LAC)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 REPLY BRIEF MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 In Support Of by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson.(Sipple, Adam)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephone conference is set for November 18, 2020, at 12:30 PM by before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Case conferencing instructions will be entered under separate order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Strike #20 by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson.(Sipple, Adam)
November 10, 2020 Filing 27 INDEX OF EXHIBIT lC SUPPORTING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #23 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendant City of Omaha. (CD or VIDEOTAPE) MAINTAINED IN CLERK'S OFFICE. (LAC)
November 10, 2020 Filing 26 EXHIBIT LIST from motion hearing held on 11/10/20 regarding Minutes, Filing. 25 . (ADB)
November 10, 2020 Filing 25 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2020 regarding MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 and MOTION to Strike #20 . Argument by plaintiff. Evidence by plaintiff. Argument by defendant. Defendant's Exhibits attached to Filing No. #23 offered and received as filed. The matter is deemed submitted and taken under advisement. Hearing held in Omaha. Courtroom Deputy: Amy Brunswick; Reporter: Brenda Fauber ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Adam J. Sipple, Daniel H. Friedman: Appearance for Defendant: Michelle A. Peters, Ryan J. Wiesen. Time Start: 10:04 AM; Time Stop: 11:15 AM; Time in Court: 1 Hour 11 Minutes. (ADB)
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 by Attorney Ryan J. Wiesen on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer.(Wiesen, Ryan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 23 INDEX in support of Index of Exhibits Supporting Brief in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 3A, #8 Exhibit 3B, #9 Exhibit 3C)(Peters, Michelle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Leave To Conduct Early Discovery #12 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer.(Peters, Michelle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike #20 by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer.(Peters, Michelle)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer.(Peters, Michelle)
November 6, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Mark Matuza defendant All Plaintiffs. (Sipple, Adam)
November 6, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon City of Omaha defendant All Plaintiffs. (Sipple, Adam)
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Todd Schmaderer defendant All Plaintiffs. (Sipple, Adam)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB)
October 29, 2020 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 . by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 14 - Adam Sipple)(Sipple, Adam)
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 INDEX MOTION for Leave To Conduct Early Discovery #12 by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - RFP)(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LAC)
October 28, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave To Conduct Early Discovery by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson.(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 . by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 15 - Liya Whatcott)(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 10 INDEX MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 10 - Melanie Buer, #2 Affidavit Exhibit 11 - Isabella Tarr, #3 Affidavit Exhibit 12 - Hannah Amrollahi, #4 Affidavit Exhibit 13 - Mahmud Fitil)(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 9 INDEX MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sec. 20-44, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sec. 20-45, #3 Exhibit 3 - Sec. 20-41, #4 Affidavit Exhibit 4 - Alexander Matthews, #5 Affidavit Exhibit 5 - Jordan Corbin, #6 Affidavit Exhibit 6 - Darren Renfrow, #7 Affidavit Exhibit 7 - Joshua Augustine, #8 Affidavit Exhibit 8 - Riley Wilson, #9 Affidavit Exhibit 9 - Katelyn Huckins)(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION For Preliminary Injunction #7 by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson.(Sipple, Adam)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION For Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Plaintiffs Joshua Augustine, Melanie Buer, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews, ProBLAC, Darren Renfrow, Liya Whatcott, Riley Wilson.(Sipple, Adam)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to November 30, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michelle A. Peters on behalf of Defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer.(Peters, Michelle)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants City of Omaha, Mark Matuza and Todd Schmaderer. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to City of Omaha, Todd Schmaderer, Mark Matuza regarding Complaint, #1 . (Sipple, Adam)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Omaha, Mark Matuza, Todd Schmaderer ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4252090), by Attorney Adam J. Sipple on behalf of Riley Wilson, Melanie Buer, Liya Whatcott, Darren Renfrow, Joshua Augustine, ProBLAC, Jordan Corbin, Katelyn Huckins, Alexander Matthews (Sipple, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ProBLAC et al v. City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ProBLAC
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Augustine
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liya Whatcott
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Wilson
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Corbin
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Renfrow
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Matthews
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Buer
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Huckins
Represented By: Stephen A. Sael
Represented By: Daniel H. Friedman
Represented By: Adam J. Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Represented By: Ryan J. Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Matuza
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Represented By: Ryan J. Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schmaderer
Represented By: Michelle A. Peters
Represented By: Ryan J. Wiesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?