Harrington et al v. City of Omaha et al
Plaintiff: Shane Harrington, Club 120, Inc., H & S Club Omaha, Inc. and Club 120, Inc. Individually and on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated doing business as Infinity
Defendant: Rich Pahls, Douglas County, Nebraska, Ben Gray, Steven Martinez, Christopher Perkins, City of Omaha, Jean Stothert, Todd Schmaderer, Vaughn Cotton, Scott Buresh, Adi Pour, Paul Lawson, James Haley, Kurt Urkoski, Chris Jerram, City Clerk Elizabeth Butler, Pete Festersen, Mike Sundermeier, Aimee Melton, Vincent J. Palermo, Duane Eivins, Jason Menning, Shawn Harper, Richard Hawthorne, Brinker Harding, Timothy Dunning, Elizabeth Butler, Vinny Palermo, Steve Martinez and Chris Perkins
Case Number: 8:2020cv00412
Filed: October 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Elizabeth Butler. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Kurt Urkoski. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Duane Eivins. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Richard Hawthorne. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant James Haley. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Vaughn Cotton. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Chris Perkins. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Mike Sundermeier. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Paul Lawson. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Scott Buresh. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Shawn Harper. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Jason Menning. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Todd Schmaderer. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Jean Stothert. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Brinker Harding. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Rich Pahls. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Vinny Palermo. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ben Gray. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Pete Festersen. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Chris Jerram. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Aimee Melton. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
November 2, 2020 Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant City of Omaha. Waiver sent on 10/15/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Adi Pour. Waiver sent on 10/22/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy Dunning. Waiver sent on 10/22/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
October 30, 2020 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas County, Nebraska. Waiver sent on 10/22/2020. (Spencer, Evan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff Club 120, Inc..(Spencer, Evan)
October 16, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Plaintiff H & S Club Omaha, Inc..(Spencer, Evan)
October 14, 2020 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to defendants Scott Buresh, Elizabeth Butler, City of Omaha, Vaughn Cotton, Douglas County, Nebraska, Timothy Dunning, Duane Eivins, Pete Festersen, Ben Gray, James Haley, Brinker Harding, Shawn Harper, Richard Hawthorne, Chris Jerram, Paul Lawson, Steve Martinez, Aimee Melton, Jason Menning, Rich Pahls, Vinny Palermo, Chris Perkins, Adi Pour, Todd Schmaderer, Jean Stothert, Mike Sundermeier and Kurt Urkoski. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 33 Summons Requested as to Shawn Harper regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Complaint #1 is stricken for the following reason: Document is incomplete. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Club 120, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 30 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff H & S Club Omaha, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
October 13, 2020 Filing 29 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
October 11, 2020 Filing 28 Summons Requested as to Adi Pour regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 27 Summons Requested as to Elizabeth Butler regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 26 Summons Requested as to Kurt Urkoski regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 25 Summons Requested as to Duane Eivins regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 24 Summons Requested as to Richard Hawthorne regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 23 Summons Requested as to James Haley regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 22 Summons Requested as to Vaughn Cotton regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 21 Summons Requested as to Chris Perkins regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Requested as to Mike Sundermeier regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 19 Summons Requested as to Paul Lawson regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to Scott Buresh regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Shawn Harper regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Jason Menning regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Requested as to Timothy Dunning regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Requested as to Steve Martinez regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Requested as to Todd Schmaderer regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Requested as to Jean Stothert regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Brinker Harding regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Rich Pahls regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Vinny Palermo regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Ben Gray regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Pete Festersen regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Chris Jerram regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Aimee Melton regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Douglas County Nebraska regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to City of Omaha regarding Complaint #2 . (Spencer, Evan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number ANEDC-4256236), by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Shane Harrington(Spencer, Evan) Modified on 10/13/2020 to add the receipt number(LRM).
October 11, 2020 Filing 1 STRICKEN - COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants, by Attorney Evan Spencer on behalf of Shane Harrington, Club 120, Inc., H & S Club Omaha, Inc.(Spencer, Evan) Modified on 10/14/2020 to add the word stricken per Order 32(LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington et al v. City of Omaha et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Pahls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Stothert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Schmaderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Buresh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adi Pour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Urkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Jerram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Clerk Elizabeth Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Festersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Sundermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimee Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J. Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Eivins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Menning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hawthorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinny Palermo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Harrington
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club 120, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H & S Club Omaha, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club 120, Inc. Individually and on Behalf of Others Similarly Situated doing business as Infinity
Represented By: Evan Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?