Lyons v. Saul
Plaintiff: Cameron Lyons
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv00440
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant U.S. Attorney General's Office in Washington, DC -US Department of Justice on 12/7/2020. (LAC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI Social Security Administration on 12/4/2020. (LAC)
December 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska on 12/2/2020. (LAC)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Andrew Saul, United States Attorney for the District of Nebraska and U.S. Attorney General's Office in Washington, DC. Originals given to USM for service. (LRM)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Plaintiff's application (Filing #2 ) is granted, and the Complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order together with three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to Plaintiff for service of process on Defendant. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the USM-285 forms and the summons forms and return them to the Clerk of the Court. The Clerk of the Court will sign the summons forms, to be forwarded with a copy of Plaintiff's Complaint to the U.S. Marshals Service for service of process. The Clerk of the Court will copy the Complaint; Plaintiff need not do so. The Marshal shall serve the summons and the Complaint without payment of costs or fees. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed)(LAC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Cameron Lyons. (LAC)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul on behalf of Cameron Lyons. (LAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyons v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?