Right at Home, LLC v. Gaudet et al
Plaintiff: Right at Home, LLC
Defendant: Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet and Gaudet & Company Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00462
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY regarding MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings #21 by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Burns, Christine)
December 30, 2020 Filing 50 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 30, 2020 Filing 49 BRIEF in opposition to DEFENDANTS' POST-HEARING BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Burns, Christine)
December 23, 2020 Filing 48 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings #21 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Opp. to Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - RAH Motion to Dismiss Gaudet & Co. Crossclaims)(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 23, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings #21 , Brief -Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings #22 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 22, 2020 Filing 46 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of completion of preliminary injunction proceedings before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon held on December 21, 2020. Pages 1 through 139. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 1/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2021. (BLF)
December 21, 2020 Filing 45 WITNESS LIST from Motion Hearing held on December 15, 2020 and December 21, 2020. (TCL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 44 EXHIBIT LIST from Motion Hearing held on December 15, 2020 and December 21, 2020.(TCL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 43 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2020 regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 . Hearing held in Omaha by video conference. Evidence by plaintiff. Evidence by defendant. The plaintiff shall file its brief by the close of business on December 30, 2020. The defendant shall file its response by the close of business on December 30, 2020. This matter is taken under advisement. Written order forthcoming. Courtroom Deputy: Tiwauna Lawrence; Reporter: Brenda Fauber ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Heather Carlson Perkins, Harvey B. Cooper and Heather Burgess: Appearance for Defendant: Christine Burns; Time Start: 10:02 AM; Time Stop: 3:16PM; Time in Court: 3 Hours 39 Minutes. (TCL)
December 21, 2020 Filing 42 INDEX in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F, Royalty Underpayment)(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 21, 2020 Filing 41 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 Supplemental Index of Evidence by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 106 Alabana Certified Nurse Aide Registry, Nurse Aide Status Report, #2 Exhibit 107 - Persopo background report for S. Ross, #3 Exhibit 108 Records sent to senior living facilities regarding S. Ross, #4 Exhibit 109 Backround Report for S. Ross, #5 Exhibit 110 S. Ross's shift schedule from ClearCare, #6 Exhibit 111 Text messages)(Burns, Christine)
December 18, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney Harvey B. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC (Cooper, Harvey)
December 17, 2020 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT (UNREDACTED) of preliminary injunction proceeding before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon held on December 15, 2020. Pages 1 through 143. In accordance with the transcript redaction procedure, available at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/internetDocs/pom/tran_redaction_procedure.pdf, the transcript can only be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter Brenda L. Fauber at (402) 661-7322 or b.fauber@yahoo.com before the expiration of the Release of Transcript Restriction deadline. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Redaction Request due 1/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2021. (BLF)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). The Motion Hearing is set for 12/21/2020 at 10:00 AM by Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 15, 2020 Filing 37 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 12/15/2020 regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 . Hearing held in Omaha. Opening statements by the parties. Evidence by plaintiff. Evidence by defendant. Hearing is continued to 12/21/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Courtroom Deputy: Tiwauna Lawrence; Reporter: ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Heather Carson Perkins and Samuel R. O'Neill: Appearance for Defendant: Christine Burns; Time Start: 2:03 PM; Time Stop: 5:26 PM; Time in Court: 3 Hours 10 Minutes. (TCL) Modified on 12/16/2020 to correct next hearing date(TCL).
December 15, 2020 Filing 36 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 Evidence for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Burns, Christine)
December 14, 2020 Filing 35 INDEX in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Declaration Margaret Haynes, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-1, 2015 FA, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-2, 2016 Assignment, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-3, Map of Alabama, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-4, 2018 FA, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-5, Background Check Best Practices, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-6, Caregiver Schedule, #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-7, Notice of Default, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-8, Notice of Termination, #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-9, ClearCare Log, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A-10, Secret Shopper, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A-11, Gaudet Deposition, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B, Declaration Petranick, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, Petranick Exhibit 1, Whistleblower Email, #15 Exhibit Exhibit C-12, 019-09-20 D Gaudet_s NOS - Supplemental documents to Plaintiff in response to RFP No. 10, #16 Exhibit Exhibit C-13, Invoice Reconconciliation, #17 Exhibit Exhibit C-14, RAH invoices, #18 Exhibit Exhibit C-15, Gaudet & Co. invoices, #19 Exhibit Exhibit C-16, RAH invoice list, #20 Exhibit Exhibit C-17, Redacted client checks, #21 Exhibit Exhibit C-18, All Carelogs Right at Home Mobile & Foley pdf, #22 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Response to Plts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO with attachment, #23 Exhibit Exhibit C-20, August 1 2018 Schedule, #24 Exhibit Exhibit D, Gaudet_RAH Secret Shopper Declaration, #25 Exhibit Exhibit E 2020-12-10 - Page Vault Affidavit - SIGNED, #26 Exhibit Exhibit E-1, 2020-12-10 LinkedIn Capture)(Carson Perkins, Heather) Modified on 12/15/2020 to seal Exhibit 22 per Judge Bataillon's chambers.(TCL).
December 14, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gaudet_RAH Evidence Index to PI Reply, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C-12, 019-09-20 D Gaudet's NOS - Supplemental documents to Plaintiff in response to RFP No. 10, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-13, Invoice Reconconciliation, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C-14, RAH invoices, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C-15, Gaudet & Co. invoices, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C-16, RAH invoice list, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C-17, Redacted client checks, #8 Exhibit Exhibit C-18, All Carelogs Right at Home Mobile & Foley, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Reponse to Plsts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO (05.08.19) with attachment_Part1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Reponse to Plsts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO (05.08.19) with attachment_Part2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Reponse to Plsts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO (05.08.19) with attachment_Part3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Reponse to Plsts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO (05.08.19) with attachment_Part4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit C-19, Reponse to Plsts 1st RFP to Gaudet & CO (05.08.19) with attachment_Part5, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C-20, August 1 2018 Schedule, #15 Exhibit Exhibit D, Gaudet_RAH Secret Shopper Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit E, 2020-12-10 - Page Vault Affidavit - SIGNED, #17 Exhibit Exhibit E-1, 2020-12-10 LinkedIn Capture)(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc. (Burns, Christine)
December 11, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Attorney Christine Burns on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc. (Burns, Christine)
December 9, 2020 Filing 31 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 Evidence in Support by Attorney Lewis R. Shreve on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Shreve, Lewis)
December 9, 2020 Filing 30 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Attorney Lewis R. Shreve on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Shreve, Lewis)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER Continuing Hearing on MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 . The defendants' motion to continue hearing is granted. The Motion Hearing is continued to 12/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Defendants shall file a brief on or before December 9, 2020 and plaintiff shall file a reply brief on or before the close of business on December 14, 2020. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TCL)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Attorney Thomas W. Griffin, III on behalf of Defendants Gaudet & Company Inc., Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet.(Griffin, Thomas)
December 3, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Continue Hearing and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof #26 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(Carson Perkins, Heather)
December 3, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Continue Hearing and Incorporated Memorandum in Support Thereof by Attorney Lewis R. Shreve on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Shreve, Lewis)
December 3, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Heather Burgess on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC (Burgess, Heather)
December 3, 2020 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #23 for attorney Lewis R. Shreve. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 2, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4291424 by Attorney Lewis R. Shreve on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Shreve, Lewis)
December 2, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings by Attorney Thomas W. Griffin, III on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint State Court, #2 Exhibit B Amended Complaint State Court, #3 Exhibit C Second AMended Complaint State Court, #4 Exhibit D Cross-Claim State Court, #5 Exhibit E Motion to Dismiss State Court, #6 Exhibit F Counterclaims)(Griffin, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2020 to correct event type from a motion to a brief (ADB).
December 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings by Attorney Thomas W. Griffin, III on behalf of Defendants Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet, Gaudet & Company Inc..(Griffin, Thomas)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #19 . Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Defendants shall file a brief on or before December 7, 2020 and plaintiff shall file a reply brief on or before December 10, 2020.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (copy e-mailed to attorney Robert Matthews as listed in motion #19 )(ADB)
November 25, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Right at Home Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Right at Home Index of Evidence In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A Haynes Decl ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction_Part1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A Haynes Decl ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction_Part2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A Haynes Decl ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction_Part3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B Petranick Decl ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Alyssa Gaudet (second service) defendant Right at Home, LLC on 11/16/2020. (Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Neal Gaudet defendant Right at Home, LLC. (Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Gaudet & Company defendant Right at Home, LLC. (Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Alyssa Gaudet defendant Right at Home, LLC on 11/11/2020. (Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 9, 2020 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Amended Complaint #10 . Exhibit C to Amended Complaint by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(O'Neill, Samuel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 13 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Amended Complaint #10 . Exhibit B to Amended Complaint by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(O'Neill, Samuel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 ATTACHMENT - CONTINUED regarding Amended Complaint #10 . Exhibit A to Amended Complaint by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(O'Neill, Samuel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Heather Carson Perkins. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Equitable and Injunctive Relief against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Right at Home, LLC(O'Neill, Samuel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Acknowledgement of Oath of Admission of Heather Carson Perkins for Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC (O'Neill, Samuel)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4273387 by Attorney Heather Carson Perkins on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(Carson Perkins, Heather)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant Alyssa Gaudet, Neal Gaudet and Gaudet & Company Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MKR)
November 3, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Defendants regarding Complaint #1 . (O'Neill, Samuel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC.(O'Neill, Samuel)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Heather Carson Perkins has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Right at Home, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4271997), by Attorney Samuel R. O'Neill on behalf of Right at Home, LLC(O'Neill, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Right at Home, LLC v. Gaudet et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Gaudet
Represented By: Thomas W. Griffin, III
Represented By: Christine Burns
Represented By: Lewis R. Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Gaudet
Represented By: Thomas W. Griffin, III
Represented By: Christine Burns
Represented By: Lewis R. Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaudet & Company Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Griffin, III
Represented By: Christine Burns
Represented By: Lewis R. Shreve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Right at Home, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Schartz
Represented By: Samuel R. O'Neill
Represented By: Heather Carson Perkins
Represented By: Heather Burgess
Represented By: Harvey B. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?