Fleming v. Heartland Family Service
Plaintiff: Jessica Fleming
Defendant: Heartland Family Service
Case Number: 8:2020cv00486
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the plaintiff shall file a signed amended complaint within one week of the date of this order. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint within 14 days thereafter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - The plaintiff shall file a signed amended complaint within one week of the date of this order. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs amended complaint within 14 days thereafter. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the plaintiff's motion for leave (Filing No. #10 ) is granted; The plaintiffs proposed amended complaint (Filing No. [10-1]) is deemed filed instanter. The defendant's motion to dismiss (Filing No. #6 ) is denied as moot without prejudice to refiling. The defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (LAC)
January 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave on behalf of Plaintiff Jessica Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Fleming, Jessica)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Service.(Joyce, Leigh)
December 22, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Heartland Family Service. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #6 by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Service.(Joyce, Leigh)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Leigh C. Joyce on behalf of Defendant Heartland Family Service.(Joyce, Leigh)
December 1, 2020 CM/ECF NextGen e-filing request from pro se plaintiff Jessica Fleming. Access granted on 12/1/20. (JLS)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that due to clerical error, this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
November 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
November 19, 2020 FILING FEE PAID on behalf of Plaintiff Jessica Fleming. Receipt number 8058353, in the amount of $400. (LKO)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Heartland Family Service. Original given to plaintiff for completion of service. (LKO)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heartland Family Service with receipt number 8058353, in the amount of $400 filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Jessica Fleming. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Heartland Family Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Family Service
Represented By: Leigh C. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?