Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Poulsen et al
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Cory Poulsen, Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC, Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC and KC Property Guys, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv00499
Filed: December 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1821
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Defendant KC Property Guys, LLC, a Kansas LLC (Lannin, Robert)
December 14, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant KC Property Guys, LLC(a Missouri Limited Liability Company). Waiver sent on 12/14/2020. (Lannin, Robert)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Cory Poulsen, Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC, Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC (a Missouri Limited Liability Company), and Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC(a Kansas Limited Liability Company) regarding Complaint #1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LAC)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC, a Kansas Limited Liability Company regarding Complaint,,,,,, #1 . (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC, a Missouri Limited Liability Company regarding Complaint,,,,,, #1 . (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC, a Kansas Limited Liability Company regarding Complaint,,,,,, #1 . (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Cory Poulsen regarding Complaint,,,,,, #1 . (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance for Plaintiff by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance for Plaintiff by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance for Plaintiff by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Lally, Elizabeth)
December 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Monetary Relief and Declaratory Judgment against KC Property Guys, LLC(a Kansas Limited Liability Company), KC Property Guys, LLC(a Missouri Limited Liability Company), Cory Poulsen, Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC, Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC(a Missouri Limited Liability Company), Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC(a Kansas Limited Liability Company), by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Promissory Note No. 86435-1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Deed of Trust dated February 10, 2015, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Debt Modification Agreement for Note No. 86435-1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Extension Addendum for Note No. 86435-1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Promissory Note No. 86482-1, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6: Superior Restoration Security Agreement dated January 17, 2014, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7: Extension Addendum for Note No. 87595, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8: Promissory Note No. 87595, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9: Promissory Note No. 86307-1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10: Extension Addendum to Note No. 86307-1, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11: Promissory Note No. 87587, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12: Forbearance Agreement, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13: Amended Terms Sheet, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14: 1424-1426 Suspense Agreement, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15: 1433-1435 Suspense Agreement, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16: 4431 Suspense Agreement, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17: 6443 Suspense Agreement, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18: 86435-1 Demand Letter, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19: 87595 Demand Letter, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20: 86307-1 Demand Letter, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21: 87587 Demand Letter)(Lally, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation v. Poulsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Represented By: Daniel J. Epstein
Represented By: Tara Holterhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Poulsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Restoration & Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Restoration Contractors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Property Guys, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?