Conde et al v. The Collection Agency, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Rocky Wamsley and Brittany Conde
Defendant: Andrew C. Maschman, John Does and The Collection Agency, LLC a Registered Tradename doing business as Collection Associates
Case Number: 8:2020cv00502
Filed: December 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to February 5, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jennifer Weller on behalf of Defendants Andrew C. Maschman, The Collection Agency, LLC.(Weller, Jennifer)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Jennifer Weller. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Terry J. Grennan is substituted as counsel of record for Defendants. Attorneys Michael A. Klutho and Christopher R. Morris are terminated as counsel of record for Defendants and shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4326167 by Attorney Jennifer Weller on behalf of Defendants Andrew C. Maschman, The Collection Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Weller, Jennifer)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Attorney Terry J. Grennan on behalf of Defendants Andrew C. Maschman, The Collection Agency, LLC.(Grennan, Terry)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Terry J. Grennan on behalf of Defendants Andrew C. Maschman, The Collection Agency, LLC (Grennan, Terry)
January 8, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 of The Collection Agency, LLC by Attorney Christopher R. Morris on behalf of Defendants The Collection Agency, LLC, Andrew C. Maschman.(Morris, Christopher)
December 31, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant The Collection Agency, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants, The Collection Agency, LLC d/b/a Collection Associates and Andrew C. Maschman, shall have an extension of time to January 29, 2021, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Christopher R. Morris on behalf of Defendants Andrew C. Maschman, The Collection Agency, LLC.(Morris, Christopher)
December 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Andrew C. Maschman on 12/15/2020. (Car, Pamela)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant The Collection Agency, LLC on 12/15/2020. (Car, Pamela)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Andrew C. Maschman and The Collection Agency, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
December 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Andrew C. Maschmann regarding Complaint, #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
December 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to The Collection Agency, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Reinbrecht, William)
December 7, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4.. (LAC)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (class acion ) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4293815), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Brittany Conde, Rocky Wamsley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A & B)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conde et al v. The Collection Agency, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Maschman
Represented By: Jennifer Weller
Represented By: Michael A. Klutho
Represented By: Terry J. Grennan
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Collection Agency, LLC a Registered Tradename doing business as Collection Associates
Represented By: Jennifer Weller
Represented By: Michael A. Klutho
Represented By: Terry J. Grennan
Represented By: Christopher R. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Wamsley
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Conde
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: O. Randolph Bragg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?