Dreyer et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Marie Dreyer and Ronald Dreyer
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00535
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Johnson & Johnson.(Huffer, Michael)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc.. by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Huffer, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson to plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to March 12, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Johnson & Johnson. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ethicon, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(ADB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 9 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson.(Huffer, Michael)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kathryn J. Cheatle on behalf of Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Cheatle, Kathryn)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Ethicon, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Feldman, Andrew)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Johnson & Johnson regarding Complaint #1 . (Feldman, Andrew)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #3 for attorney Andrew Feldman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4307239 by Attorney Andrew Feldman on behalf of Plaintiffs Marie Dreyer, Ronald Dreyer.(Feldman, Andrew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4306567), by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Marie Dreyer, Ronald Dreyer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Younes, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dreyer et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michael K. Huffer
Represented By: Kathryn J. Cheatle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Dreyer
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Represented By: Andrew Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Dreyer
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Represented By: Andrew Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?