Great Northern Insurance Company v. Aegis Scientific, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: HMC Enterprises, LLC doing business as Howard/McCray and Aegis Scientific, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00539
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/26/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
February 26, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Aegis Scientific, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Aegis Scientific, Inc. (Welch, David)
February 19, 2021 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Clabo Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Clabo Holding USA, Inc., Corporate Parent Clabo SpA, Corporate Parent Clabo SpA, Other Affiliate Diane Scott, Other Affiliate Diane Scott for HMC Enterprises, LLC. by Attorney Brian T. McKernan on behalf of Defendants HMC Enterprises, LLC, Clabo Holding USA, Inc., Clabo Holding USA, Inc., Clabo SpA, Clabo SpA, Diane Scott, Diane Scott.(McKernan, Brian)
February 19, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by HMC Enterprises, LLC (McKernan, Brian)
February 11, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Aegis Scientific, Inc. on 2/5/2021. (Keith, Robert)
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney David L. Welch on behalf of Defendant Aegis Scientific, Inc. (Welch, David)
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant HMC Enterprises, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Michael L. DeBona. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 FINAL MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4330035 by Attorney Michael L. DeBona on behalf of Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company.(DeBona, Michael)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Defendant HMC Enterprises, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. HMC Enterprises, LLC shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before February 19, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Brian T. McKernan on behalf of Defendant HMC Enterprises, LLC.(McKernan, Brian)
January 27, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendant Aegis Scientific, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Aegis Scientific, Inc.. (Keith, Robert)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Aegis Scientific, Inc. regarding Complaint, #1 . (Keith, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited for Great Northern Insurance Company. by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Plaintiffs Great Northern Insurance Company, Chubb Limited, Chubb Limited.(Keith, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant HMC Enterprises, LLC on 1/8/2021. (Keith, Robert)
December 31, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Aegis Scientific, Inc. and HMC Enterprises, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
December 31, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Michael L. DeBona has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
December 31, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Keith, Robert)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Keith, Robert)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4307964), by Attorney Robert S. Keith on behalf of Great Northern Insurance Company as subrogee of Health Systems of Beatrice, Inc.(Keith, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Aegis Scientific, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMC Enterprises, LLC doing business as Howard/McCray
Represented By: Brian T. McKernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Scientific, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert S. Keith
Represented By: Michael L. DeBona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?