McFarland v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Melaney McFarland
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv03020
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY regarding Brief #13 by Attorney Benjamin M. Weston on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer Partial #10 by Attorney Francis E. Younes on behalf of Plaintiff Melaney McFarland.(Younes, Francis)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - case reassigned to Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (ADB)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before March 31, 2020, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" form located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL)
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer Partial by Attorney Benjamin M. Weston on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Pre-Answer Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Weston, Benjamin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Benjamin M. Weston. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4118737 by Attorney Benjamin M. Weston on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Weston, Benjamin)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc., Corporate Parent Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendants Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc., Home Depot, Inc..(Bottorf, Emily)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall have an extension of time to March 11, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (until March 11, 2020) by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Bottorf, Emily)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Benjamin M. Weston has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Melaney McFarland from District Court of Douglas County Nebraska, Case number CI 20 242 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4112798) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Emily R. Bottorf on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(Bottorf, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarland v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melaney McFarland
Represented By: Francis E. Younes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin M. Weston
Represented By: Emily R. Bottorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?