Club Car Wash Operating, LLC v. Rocket Carwash, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Club Car Wash Operating, LLC doing business as Club Carwash
Defendant: City Ventures, LLC and Rocket Carwash, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv03156
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due January 7, 2022. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on January 11, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
February 11, 2021 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Defendant City Ventures, LLC.(Jeffries, Richard)
February 11, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Defendant Rocket Carwash, LLC.(Jeffries, Richard)
February 10, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Plaintiff Club Car Wash Operating, LLC.(Hale, William)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion to Extend. Defendants shall file their corporate disclosure statements on or before February 11, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
February 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Extend deadline to file corporate disclosure statement by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Defendants City Ventures, LLC, Rocket Carwash, LLC.(Jeffries, Richard)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/22/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Rocket Carwash, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant City Ventures, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by City Ventures, LLC, Rocket Carwash, LLC (Jeffries, Richard)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Midwest Car Wash Holdings, LLC for Club Car Wash Operating, LLC. by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Plaintiffs Club Car Wash Operating, LLC, Midwest Car Wash Holdings, LLC.(Hale, William)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Rocket Carwash, LLC on 12/28/2020. (Hale, William)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant City Ventures, LLC on 12/28/2020. (Hale, William)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - that in the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (LKO)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants City Ventures, LLC and Rocket Carwash, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Club Car Wash Operating, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
December 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Hale, William)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Plaintiff regarding Complaint #1 . (Hale, William)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4304552), by Attorney William J. Hale on behalf of Club Car Wash Operating, LLC d/b/a Club Car Wash(Hale, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Club Car Wash Operating, LLC v. Rocket Carwash, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Paul B. Donahue
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocket Carwash, LLC
Represented By: Paul B. Donahue
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club Car Wash Operating, LLC doing business as Club Carwash
Represented By: William J. Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?