Leach v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David A Leach and David A. Leach
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intention to Serve Rule 45 Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
March 1, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #10 by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of Plaintiff David A. Leach (Blakeman, Cletus)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Serving Defendant's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Planning Conference set for 12/31/2021 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendant State Farm Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant State Farm Insurance Company, by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of David A. Leach(Blakeman, Cletus)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before February 12, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend Complaint by Attorney Cletus W. Blakeman on behalf of Plaintiff David A. Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blakeman, Cletus)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for February 18, 2021. On or before February 8, 2021, a party shall contact the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge to set a conference call if needed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JAB)
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by State Farm Insurance Company (Rezac, Rex)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Insurance Company. by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of Defendants State Farm Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Rezac, Rex)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant State Farm Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against David A Leach from Douglas County District Court, Case number 20-10141 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4310823) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Rex A. Rezac on behalf of State Farm Insurance Company(Rezac, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leach v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Rex A. Rezac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Leach
Represented By: Cletus W. Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Leach
Represented By: Cletus W. Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?