Francis v. Douglas County
Plaintiff: Adam Francis
Defendant: Jane Doe, Douglas County, John Doe, Wellpath LLC and Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00018
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #9 by Douglas County (Woolf, Joshua)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wellpath LLC on 2/11/2021. (Conway, Sean)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Douglas County's Motion to Dismiss (Filing No. #4 ) is denied without prejudice as moot. Ordered by Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (JSF)
February 9, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendant Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Wellpath LLC regarding Amended Complaint #9 . (Conway, Sean)
February 9, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Sean M. Conway on behalf of Adam Francis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Sean)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint by February 11, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Petition by Attorney Sean M. Conway on behalf of Plaintiff Adam Francis. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Exhibit)(Conway, Sean)
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #4 by Attorney Meghan M. Bothe on behalf of Defendant Douglas County.(Bothe, Meghan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #4 by Attorney Meghan M. Bothe on behalf of Defendant Douglas County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Daniel Esch, #2 Exhibit A Wellpath Contract, #3 Exhibit B DCC Records)(Bothe, Meghan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Meghan M. Bothe on behalf of Defendant Douglas County.(Bothe, Meghan)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joshua R. Woolf on behalf of Defendant Douglas County Nebraska (Woolf, Joshua)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Adam Francis from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 20-10640 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4317228) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Meghan M. Bothe on behalf of Douglas County Nebraska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Summons)(Bothe, Meghan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Douglas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Joshua R. Woolf
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Joshua R. Woolf
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Joshua R. Woolf
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Francis
Represented By: Sean M. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?