Sheeks v. CNH Industrial LLC
Plaintiff: Scott Sheeks
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC and CNH Industrial LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00028
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - The deposition deadline, including but not limited to depositions for oral testimony only under Rule 45, is December 1, 2021. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge by telephone on December 2, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. (Filing No. #9 ) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting - Settlement Likely by Attorney Jonathan V. Rehm on behalf of Plaintiff Scott Sheeks.(Rehm, Jonathan)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Email Motion. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline extended to 3/10/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT EMAIL MOTION of the parties to extend deadline to submit Rule 26(f) Report. (RMW)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Case New Holland Industrial, Inc., Corporate Parent CNH Industrial N.V., Corporate Parent CNH Industrial U.S. Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Borsa Italiana S.p.A. for CNH Industrial LLC. by Attorney Brian J. Fahey on behalf of Defendants CNH Industrial LLC, Case New Holland Industrial, Inc., CNH Industrial U.S. Holdings Inc., CNH Industrial N.V., Borsa Italiana S.p.A..(Fahey, Brian)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Chelsea J. Bodin. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Joel O'Malley. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/5/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Chelsea J. Bodin Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4330210 by Attorney Chelsea J. Bodin on behalf of Defendant CNH Industrial LLC.(Bodin, Chelsea)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel O'Malley Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4330200 by Attorney Joel O'Malley on behalf of Defendant CNH Industrial LLC.(O'Malley, Joel)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by CNH Industrial LLC (Thalken, Timothy)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Chelsea Bodin has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joel O'Malley has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant CNH Industrial LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Scott Sheeks from District Court Hall County Nebraska, Case number CI 21-3 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4323201) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Timothy J. Thalken on behalf of CNH Industrial America LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Thalken, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheeks v. CNH Industrial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sheeks
Represented By: Jonathan V. Rehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Fahey
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial LLC
Represented By: Brian J. Fahey
Represented By: Timothy J. Thalken
Represented By: Joel O'Malley
Represented By: Chelsea J. Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?