Vanicek v. Kratt et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Vanicek
Defendant: Kenneth E. Kratt and Sandair Corporation
Intervenor Plaintiff: Lyman-Richey Corporation doing business as Central Sand and Gravel Company
Case Number: 8:2021cv00049
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Strike Complaint #1 Paragraphs 7, 8, 22, 25, 30, & closing prayer #13 by Attorney Lawrence J. G. Roland on behalf of Defendant Sandair Corporation.(Roland, Lawrence)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Complaint #1 Paragraphs 7, 8, 22, 25, 30, & closing prayer by Attorney Lawrence J. G. Roland on behalf of Defendant Sandair Corporation.(Roland, Lawrence)
March 29, 2021 Filing 12 Intervenor COMPLAINT against All Defendants, by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Lyman-Richey Corporation(Reece, Jarrod)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motion for Leave to File Modified Complaint in Intervention. After review of Plaintiff's modified proposed complaint in intervention [10-1] and for the reasons previously stated in the Court's order granting the motion to intervene #9 , Intervenor Lyman-Richey Corporation, d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel shall file its modified complaint in intervention on or before March 29, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Modified Complaint in Intervention by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Intervenor Plaintiff Lyman-Richey Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Modified Complaint in Intervention)(Reece, Jarrod)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Lyman-Richey Corporation, d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel Company's Motion to Intervene (Filing No. #5 ) is granted. Lyman-Richey Corporation shall file its Complaint in Intervention (Filing No. #7 ) on or before March 23, 2021. The Clerk of Court shall add Lyman-Richey Corporation, d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel Company to the case caption as Intervenor-Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MKR)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of regarding MOTION to Intervene #5 Joint Notice of Consent to Intervention by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Intervenor Lyman-Richey Corporation (Reece, Jarrod)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 INDEX in support of MOTION to Intervene #5 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Intervenor Lyman-Richey Corporation d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint in Intervention)(Reece, Jarrod)
March 8, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Intervene #5 by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Intervenor Lyman-Richey Corporation d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel.(Reece, Jarrod)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Intervene by Attorney Jarrod D. Reece on behalf of Intervenor Lyman-Richey Corporation d/b/a Central Sand and Gravel.(Reece, Jarrod)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Sandair Corporation. Waiver sent on 3/1/2021. (Demerath, Larry)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Kenneth E. Kratt. Waiver sent on 3/1/2021. (Demerath, Larry)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against KENNETH E KRATT, SANDAIR CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4336699), by Attorney Larry R. Demerath on behalf of JESSICA VANICEK(Demerath, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vanicek v. Kratt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Vanicek
Represented By: Larry R. Demerath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth E. Kratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandair Corporation
Represented By: Lawrence J. G. Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Lyman-Richey Corporation doing business as Central Sand and Gravel Company
Represented By: Bryan S. Hatch
Represented By: Jarrod D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?