Wynn-Thomas v. Dempsey et al
Plaintiff: Mikeese Wynn-Thomas
Defendant: Robert Marcusso, Douglas County, Nebraska, Omaha Police Division and Patrick Dempsey
Case Number: 8:2021cv00054
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting the Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff Mikeese Wynn-Thomas shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $28.23 by May 13, 2021, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 5/13/2021: initial partial filing fee. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Plaintiff's institution)(MKR)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Mikeese Wynn-Thomas. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (MKR)
March 31, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (MKR)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (MKR)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Mikeese Wynn-Thomas.(MKR)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Patrick Dempsey, Douglas County, Nebraska, Robert Marcusso and Omaha Police Division. No Summons issued, filed on behalf of Plaintiff Mikeese Wynn-Thomas.(MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wynn-Thomas v. Dempsey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikeese Wynn-Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marcusso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omaha Police Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dempsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?